This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2020 at 01:21:45 (UTC).

TERESA GOMEZ ET AL VS AWAD HOME FASHIONS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/22/2018 TERESA GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AWAD HOME FASHIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6977

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GOMEZ TERESA

GOMEZ MARIO

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-50

REYNOLDS ROBERT J.

AWAD HOME FASHIONS INC.

FISCH PROPERTIES LP

Cross Defendant

AWAD HOME FASHION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHEKARCHIAN HALEH ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BOUCHE JACQUELINE

KIRKPATRICK JASON ALEXANDER

KIRKPATRICK JASON A.

KIRKPATRICK JASON ALEXANDER ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/2/2020: Request for Dismissal

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/17/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/20/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

7/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Motion to Continue Trial Date

1/29/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES, FILED ...)

2/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES, FILED ...)

Request for Dismissal

11/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

11/12/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

11/12/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Mail

10/23/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - ANSWER ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AWAD HOME FASHIONS, INC,I DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/16/2019: Answer - ANSWER ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AWAD HOME FASHIONS, INC,I DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/16/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/30/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/15/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

SUMMONS -

5/22/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/22/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Teresa Gomez (Plaintiff); Mario Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Trial and Related Dates); Filed by Awad Home Fashions, Inc. (Defendant); Robert J. Reynolds (Defendant); Fisch Properties LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Awad Home Fashions, Inc. (Defendant); Robert J. Reynolds (Defendant); Fisch Properties LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Awad Home Fashions, Inc. (Defendant); Robert J. Reynolds (Defendant); Fisch Properties LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial (and Related Dates, Filed by the Defendants) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial and Related Dates, Filed ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint ((Dismissed with Prejudice 11/15/2019)); Filed by Robert J. Reynolds (Defendant); Fisch Properties LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Robert J. Reynolds (Defendant); Fisch Properties LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Robert J. Reynolds (Defendant); Fisch Properties LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Robert J. Reynolds (Defendant); Fisch Properties LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Teresa Gomez (Plaintiff); Mario Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Teresa Gomez (Plaintiff); Mario Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Teresa Gomez (Plaintiff); Mario Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706977    Hearing Date: February 27, 2020    Dept: 29

Gomez et al. v. Awad Home Fashions Inc. et al.

Motion to Continue Trial and Related Dates by Stipulations is GRANTED.

Trial is continued is to September 14, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.  Final status conference is continued to August 31, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.  Discovery and motion cut off dates are to be determined based on the new trial date.

The trial date is firm. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses of the new date immediately. The Court has granted this continuance to the date selected by the parties. The Court presumes that the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period. No further continuances should be expected. 

The parties must diligently prepare for trial, including the completion of expert discovery, even if the parties intend to participate in mediation and are hopeful the case will settle.

All discovery and motion cut-off dates are to be determined based on the new trial date.

The Moving Party is ordered to give notice.