This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2023 at 21:14:03 (UTC).

TEODIK GRIGORIAN VS FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 TEODIK GRIGORIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4973

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIGORIAN TEODIK

Defendant

FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEINBERG TREVOR

Defendant Attorney

DOWNES PATRICK N.

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/17/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 07/21/2023

7/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 07/21/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)

7/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)

Notice of Settlement

7/20/2023: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL

4/18/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE:)

2/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE:)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/10/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Separate Statement

12/6/2022: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DERRIK SCHUMM & DEFS PMK

12/6/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DERRIK SCHUMM & DEFS PMK

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE:)

8/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE:)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE:)

8/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE:)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE:) OF 08/17/2022

8/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE:) OF 08/17/2022

Answer

3/25/2022: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/28/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/30/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

5/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/3/2022: Case Management Statement

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2023
  • Hearing10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement of Settlement Of Entire Case (Conditional): Name Extension: of Settlement Of Entire Case (Conditional) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order:)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order:) of 07/21/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 08/29/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - ID: 966942387742 scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAddress for Trevor Weinberg (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Teodik Grigorian (Plaintiff); As to: First American Specialty Insurance Company, an insurance company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Teodik Grigorian (Plaintiff); As to: First American Specialty Insurance Company, an insurance company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Teodik Grigorian (Plaintiff); As to: First American Specialty Insurance Company, an insurance company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Theresa M. Traber in Department 47 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less