This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 02:27:23 (UTC).

TENEKA SULLIVAN VS RICHARD VALENTA

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by TENEKA SULLIVAN against RICHARD VALENTA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0484

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SULLIVAN TENEKA

Respondents and Defendants

VALENTA RICHARD

DOES 1 TO 50

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE REUEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

5/15/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE REUEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CML

5/15/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CML

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

6/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. WARD; (PROPOSEDI ORDER

8/28/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. WARD; (PROPOSEDI ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. WARD; [PROPOSEDI ORDER

8/28/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. WARD; [PROPOSEDI ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. WARD; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

8/28/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN M. WARD; IPROPOSEDI ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO COMPEL

9/25/2018: ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Minute Order

9/25/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF LIEN

9/28/2018: NOTICE OF LIEN

Substitution of Attorney

10/1/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/16/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/24/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

7/2/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

ANSWER TO IJP4VERTFIED COMPLAINT OF TENEKA SULLIVAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

4/2/2018: ANSWER TO IJP4VERTFIED COMPLAINT OF TENEKA SULLIVAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/2/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

1/16/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

1/16/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Teneka Sullivan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Richard Valenta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Richard Valenta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Richard Valenta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Teneka Sullivan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE:DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION;AND ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL CML

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • ANSWER TO IJP4VERTFIED COMPLAINT OF TENEKA SULLIVAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Richard Valenta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Richard Valenta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Teneka Sullivan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Teneka Sullivan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690484    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TENEKA SULLIVAN,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

RICHARD VALENTA, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC690484

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 18, 2019

Defendant propounded a demand for IME on Plaintiff on 4/10/19, setting the IME for 5/29/19. Plaintiff notified Defendant at 3:09 p.m. the day before an inability to appear and a cancellation fee was incurred. Defendant propounded a second demand for IME on 6/26/19, setting the IME for 8/02/19. Plaintiff did not give notice of her intention not to appear, but again failed to appear.

On 9/04/19, the Court entered an order granting Defendant’s motion to compel Plaintiff to appear at her IME and ordered her to pay sanctions. To date, Plaintiff has not complied with the order; at this time, Defendant seeks an order imposing terminating sanctions.

Pursuant to Deyo v. Kilbourne (1978) 84 Cal.App.3d 771, 776, the Court should typically impose lesser sanctions prior to awarding terminating sanctions. However, there are circumstances where imposition of terminating sanctions is appropriate without first imposing issue and/or evidentiary sanctions. See Laguna Auto Body v. Farmers Ins. Exch. (1991) 231 Cal.App.3d 481, 490-91.

Terminating sanctions are imposed at this time for three reasons. First, the Court previously imposed monetary sanctions. Second, Defendant cannot meaningfully prepare for trial without an IME, and therefore an issue or evidentiary sanction would be tantamount to a terminating sanction. Third, Plaintiff has not opposed this motion and appears to have abandoned the case.

Plaintiff’s case against Moving Defendant is dismissed. Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.