This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2023 at 04:04:31 (UTC).

TENAYA JACKSON VS CBRE, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 TENAYA JACKSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CBRE, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GARY Y. TANAKA and RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0543

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GARY Y. TANAKA

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON TENAYA

Defendants

CBRE GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

CBRE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

Defendant Attorneys

BYKERK RYAN C.

MOHAMMADI SARAH

DAMRON-HSIAO KYMBERLEIGH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

10/13/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

5/31/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Response (name extension) Response Joint Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/30/2023: Response (name extension) Response Joint Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

4/13/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Response (name extension) Response JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

4/11/2023: Response (name extension) Response JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

3/9/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Response (name extension) Response JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

3/2/2023: Response (name extension) Response JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

12/15/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Response (name extension) Response Joint Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

12/9/2022: Response (name extension) Response Joint Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

10/28/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Appearance

10/6/2022: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service by Mail Proof of Service

9/26/2022: Proof of Service by Mail Proof of Service

Minute Order Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference & Status Conference)

9/20/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference & Status Conference)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of William Nelson In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

8/26/2022: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of William Nelson In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration

8/26/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of Sarah Mohammadi In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

8/26/2022: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of Sarah Mohammadi In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of Betty Matthews In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

8/26/2022: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of Betty Matthews In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/31/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketResponse Joint Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Tenaya Jackson (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/31/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketResponse JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); Filed by: Tenaya Jackson (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/13/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
74 More Docket Entries
07/30/2021

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tenaya Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: CBRE, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); CBRE GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tenaya Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: CBRE, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); CBRE GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tenaya Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: CBRE, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); CBRE GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 21TRCV00543 Hearing Date: March 9, 2022 Dept: B

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT – SOUTHWEST DISTRICT

Honorable Gary Y. Tanaka Wednesday, March 9, 2022

Department B Calendar No. 4

PROCEEDINGS

Tenaya Jackson v. CBRE, Inc., et al.

21TRCV00543

  1. CBRE, Inc., et al.’s Motion for Stay of Proceedings

    TENTATIVE RULING

    CBRE, Inc., et al.’s Motion for Stay of Proceedings is denied.

    Background

    Plaintiff Tenaya Jackson filed her Complaint on July 26, 2021. Plaintiff is a former employee of Defendants. Plaintiff filed this action on behalf of herself and similarly aggrieved non-exempt employees under the Private Attorneys General Act (“PAGA”) for recovery of civil penalties pursuant to Labor Code Section 2698, et seq.

    Motion for Stay

    Defendant moves for an order staying this matter in its entirety pending resolution of the United States Supreme Court’s decision in Viking River Cruises, Inc. v. Moriana (-- S.Ct. -- , 2021 WL 5911481, [Dec. 15, 2021]) (“Viking River”). Defendant argues that the outcome of that case may determine the gateway question of whether Plaintiff’s PAGA Complaint is viable at all, independent of the merits. Defendant contends that a ruling by the United States Supreme Court may find that the arbitration clause entered into by the parties in this action would be enforceable.

    Pursuant to CCP 128 and through its equitable power, the trial court has broad authority to stay actions in the interests of justice and to promote judicial efficiency. See, Freiberg v. City of Mission Viejo (1995) 33 Cal.App.4th 1484, 1489. As relevant here, the Court may stay an action when concurrent litigation involves similar and/or overlapping parties and claims wherein resolution of the similar action may have direct bearing on issues in the action to which the stay may be warranted. See, Dolwing v. Farmers Ins. Exchange (2012) 208 Cal.App.4th 685, 691-92.

Here, moving party has failed to adequately establish that the interest of justice supports a stay of the instant action, at this time. Defendant seeks a stay based on the hypothetical possibility that the United States Supreme Court may make a ruling which overrules existing case law concerning arbitration of PAGA actions. Defendant does not dispute that the current established authority provides that private employment agreements can neither waive PAGA enforcement proceedings nor compel the real party in interest, the State of California, to arbitration. Iskanian v. CLS Transportation Los Angeles LLC (2014) 59 Cal.4th 348, 382-84. Further, a stay of this action would undermine the legislature’s policy for speedy resolutions of workplace violation claims. Brown v. Ralphs Grocery Co. (2018) 28 Cal.App.5th 824, 840 (noting that the one-year statute of limitations emphasizes the Legislature’s desire for quick action on workplace violations.)

Finally, even assuming for sake of discussion that the U.S. Supreme Court renders a decision which overrules Iskanian in a complete or limited manner, Defendant would still be required to file a motion to compel arbitration. Presumably, all the mechanisms currently in place for a party to challenge enforcement of the arbitration provision, i.e., procedural and substantive unconscionability, would remain. The opposition filed by Plaintiff makes clear that Plaintiff would challenge the arbitration provision based on those arguments. Therefore, it would be premature, at this time, to simply make a finding that the action would automatically proceed to arbitration. The Court notes that much of the arguments made by the parties mirror arguments that would be made in a motion to compel arbitration, and the corresponding opposition to such a theoretical motion. The Court makes no findings with respect to this issue as it is premature and not currently before this Court. The Court’s ruling on this motion does not preclude Defendant’s right to bring a motion to compel arbitration should existing case law warrant the filing of such a motion in the future.

Thus, Defendant’s Motion to Stay is denied.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.