This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 15:38:22 (UTC).

TEMPHOME SERVICES VS MEGAN BRYSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 TEMPHOME SERVICES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MEGAN BRYSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1904

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEMPHOME SERVICES

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP

DAY BRETT

BRYSON MEGAN

BRYSON JASON

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BRYSON MEGAN

BRYSON JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES LAWRENCE C.

Defendant Attorneys

MILLER CAMERON MICHAEL

RUSSUM BLAKE J.

CONOVER JACLYN DENISE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/7/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/7/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER

3/21/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT; AND PROPOSED ORDER THERETO

11/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT; AND PROPOSED ORDER THERETO

Cross-Complaint

11/12/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)

11/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)

Notice - NOTICE OF SIGNED ORDER TO THE STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SIGNED ORDER TO THE STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES

4/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES

Answer

5/3/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

4/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

Order - ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/22/2021: Order - ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL'S DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/12/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

4/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF TEMPHOME'S THIRD RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF TEMPHOME'S THIRD RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Hearing06/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketStipulated Protective Order and [Proposed] Protective Order; Filed by Liberty Mutual Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Liberty Mutual Group (Cross-Complainant); Brett Day (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Liberty Mutual Group (Cross-Complainant); Brett Day (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Liberty Mutual Group (Cross-Complainant); Brett Day (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Liberty Mutual Group (Cross-Complainant); Brett Day (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Signed Order to the Stipulation for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint); Filed by Brett Day (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Brett Day (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Brett Day (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Jaclyn D. Conover In Support Of Plaintiff Temphome Services And Defendants Liberty Mutual Group And Brett Days Joint Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time For The Court To Hear Defendants Demurrers); Filed by Temphome Services (Plaintiff); Brett Day (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff Temphome Services And Defendants Liberty Mutual Group And Bretty Days Joint Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time For The Court To Hear Defendants Demurrers; Filed by Temphome Services (Plaintiff); Brett Day (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Brett Day (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Brett Day (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Temphome Services (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Temphome Services (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Temphome Services (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Temphome Services (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES LAWRENCE C.