This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 05:17:14 (UTC).

TEIGHLOR SMITH VS NLPI 2019-1 BORROWER, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 TEIGHLOR SMITH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NLPI 2019-1 BORROWER, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0030

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH TEIGHLOR

Defendants

NLPI 2019-1 BORROWER LLC

PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUI BINH

Defendant Attorneys

PRICE RICHARD S. II

CHIN ARCHIE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/20/2022: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/20/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/20/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/03/2022

8/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/03/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/29/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

7/29/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/29/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

6/20/2022: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/20/2022

6/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/20/2022

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 08/03/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 updated: Result Date to 08/03/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions, Including Dismissal, Should Not Be Imposed Against Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Attorney for Failure to Prosecute Case scheduled for 08/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer to Complaint of Teighlor Smith by Defendant NLP12019 Borrower, LLC: Name Extension: to Complaint of Teighlor Smith by Defendant NLP12019 Borrower, LLC; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: NLPI 2019-1 Borrower, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Teighlor Smith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Teighlor Smith (Plaintiff); As to: NLPI 2019-1 Borrower, LLC (Defendant); Progressive Property Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Teighlor Smith (Plaintiff); As to: NLPI 2019-1 Borrower, LLC (Defendant); Progressive Property Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Teighlor Smith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Teighlor Smith (Plaintiff); As to: NLPI 2019-1 Borrower, LLC (Defendant); Progressive Property Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant