This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2023 at 05:20:46 (UTC).

TEHRANI JENNIFER VS ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 TEHRANI JENNIFER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERTSON'S READY MIX,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3823

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER TEHRANI

Defendants

BRYANT CHRIS ALLEN

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WERKSMAN ESQ NATHAN

Defendant Attorney

MAGWOOD JEFF

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE.) OF 10/06/2021

10/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE.) OF 10/06/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE.)

10/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE.)

Notice of Settlement

10/6/2021: Notice of Settlement

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1; DECLARATION OF JONATHAN H. DAVIDI

8/4/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1; DECLARATION OF JONATHAN H. DAVIDI

Exhibit List

8/9/2021: Exhibit List

Witness List

8/9/2021: Witness List

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

8/10/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

8/10/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

8/10/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO C...)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO C...)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE VIDEO SURVEILLANCE OF PLAINTIFF TAKEN AT THE DIRECTION OF DEFENDANT; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GLASSMAN

7/28/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE VIDEO SURVEILLANCE OF PLAINTIFF TAKEN AT THE DIRECTION OF DEFENDANT; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GLASSMAN

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND FSC

5/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND FSC

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING WAIVING JURY TRIAL AND CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

5/18/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING WAIVING JURY TRIAL AND CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/1/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

3/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA

4/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Tehrani Jennifer on 09/23/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Tehrani Jennifer as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Tehrani Jennifer (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case.) of 10/06/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to C...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 03/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Tehrani Jennifer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 2 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tehrani Jennifer (Plaintiff); As to: Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc. (Defendant); Chris Allen Bryant (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tehrani Jennifer (Plaintiff); As to: Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc. (Defendant); Chris Allen Bryant (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tehrani Jennifer (Plaintiff); As to: Robertson's Ready Mix, Inc. (Defendant); Chris Allen Bryant (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less