This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 02:25:14 (UTC).

TEDDY SERRATO VS A & J SMOKE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2017 TEDDY SERRATO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A J SMOKE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6962

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SERRATO TEDDY

Defendants and Respondents

SHENZHEN MXJO TECHNOLOGY CO LIMITED

A & J SMOKE INC

VAPE GT

PERFECTION PEN LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GLASS TECH WHOLESALES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW ANGARELLA

Defendant Attorney

GASTELUM OMAR ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

11/9/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 11/09/2018

11/9/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 11/09/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by TEDDY SERRATO on 01/12/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 11/09/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 updated: Result Date to 11/09/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketLegacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal scheduled for 01/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/09/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 updated: Result Date to 10/30/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 updated: Result Date to 10/30/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Final Status Conference scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 10/30/2018 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDocument:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketDocument:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketDocument:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketDocument:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDocument:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 01/13/20 at 8:30 am Patricia D. Nieto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less