This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 14:22:08 (UTC).

TECUM CHAY CIPRIANO VS NATHAN ALEXANDER ANDRADE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 TECUM CHAY CIPRIANO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATHAN ALEXANDER ANDRADE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4677

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIPRIANO TECUM CHAY

Defendants

ANDRADE NATHAN ALEXANDER

POSTMATES INC.

RASIER LLC

RASIER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMSON CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

SCHULER ALEXIS B.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

8/27/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/13/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/6/2021: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2024
  • Hearing07/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Hearing01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Hearing12/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Postmates Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Postmates Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tecum Chay Cipriano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where POSTMATES INC. is a litigant