This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2019 at 09:25:02 (UTC).

TECHNOLOGY FROM HEAVEN UNLIMITED VS MATTEL, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 TECHNOLOGY FROM HEAVEN UNLIMITED filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MATTEL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4869

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TECHNOLOGY FROM HEAVEN UNLIMITED A NON-PROFIT CORPORATION

Defendant

MATTEL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEINHART TERRAN

STEINHART TERRAN T.

Defendant Attorneys

ISER LAWRENCE Y

SPANIER KRISTEN LOUISE

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

9/17/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/24/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

9/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Order - FINAL RULING-DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/25/2019: Order - FINAL RULING-DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

8/5/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/10/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT

7/15/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT MATTEL, INC.S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF PATRICIA A. MILLETT IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/22/2019: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT MATTEL, INC.S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF PATRICIA A. MILLETT IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Request for Judicial Notice

5/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Order - ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/10/2019: Order - ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/10/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT MATTEL, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

4/18/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT MATTEL, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/13/2019: Complaint

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketFinal Ruling-Demurrer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/25/2019, Final Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Mattel, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Mattel, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketReply (Memorandum in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint); Filed by Mattel, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Mattel, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketOrder (CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Technology from Heaven Unlimited, a non-profit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order ( TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Technology from Heaven Unlimited, a non-profit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketOrder (RE STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT MATTEL, EXTENDING DEFENDANT MATTEL, COMPLAINT); Filed by Mattel, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (EXTENDING DEFENDANT MATTEL, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT); Filed by Mattel, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Technology from Heaven Unlimited, a non-profit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Technology from Heaven Unlimited, a non-profit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Technology from Heaven Unlimited, a non-profit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATTEL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAWRENCE Y. ISER