This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 07:19:02 (UTC).

TEAM CFO, INC. VS LUXVUE, LTD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 TEAM CFO, INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against LUXVUE, LTD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0075

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TEAM CFO INC.

Respondents

ARCHITECTURAL INSTALLATION INC. DBA L&M INSTALLATIONS

LUXVUE LTD DBA TRU ARCHITECTURAL

12600 YUKON AVE LLC

GOLDENBERG DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GROSSMAN LESLIE K.

Respondent Attorney

SENET THEODORE LESLIE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

8/5/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

8/7/2019: Minute Order

Notice

7/2/2019: Notice

Minute Order

6/27/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

6/7/2019: Case Management Statement

Order - Dismissal

5/22/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

5/22/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

5/23/2019: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

5/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

Opposition

5/20/2019: Opposition

Case Management Statement

4/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/3/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Minute Order

4/5/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Team CFO, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbit...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Team CFO, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (Continuance Case Mgmt Conf); Filed by Team CFO, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Luxvue, Ltd (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Team CFO, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Team CFO, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Team CFO, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Team CFO, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Team CFO, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Carrie Hidding); Filed by Team CFO, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketPetition (to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Team CFO, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0075    Hearing Date: March 10, 2020    Dept: 44

The court intends to deny the petition on the ground that no proof of service on the other parent, or declaration as to why such service could not be made, was filed. Petitioner may, but need not, appear and be heard. If petitioner does not appear, the petition will be dismissed without prejudice and petitioner may reapply.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUXVUE LTD. DBA TRU ARCHITECTURAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCHITECTURAL INSTALLATION INC. DBA L&M INSTALLATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSSMAN LESLIE KENNETH