This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 03:32:06 (UTC).

TEAJAH JOHNSON VS ROCHELLE EXUM

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 TEAJAH JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROCHELLE EXUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0927

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JOHNSON TEAJAH

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

EXUM ROCHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHEMTOUB MICHAEL

BAUMAN SHAUN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

HANFF ROBERT ATLEE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

10/24/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

10/24/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/24/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Answer

5/13/2019: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

4/11/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

4/9/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ROCHELLE EXUM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by TEAJAH JOHNSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TEAJAH JOHNSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0927    Hearing Date: February 20, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TEAJAH JOHNSON,

Plaintiff,

vs.

ROCHELLE EXUM, et al.,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)))

Case No.: ****0927

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

February 20, 2020

Defendant’s motions are granted.  Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories and demand to produce, inspect and copy documents and other tangible things, without objections, within ten days.  (Code Civ. Proc., ;; 2030.290(b), 2031.300(b); Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc., supra, 148 Cal.App.4th at 404.)

Defendant seeks sanctions against Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s counsel in the amount of $847.50 for each motion.  Sanctions are mandatory unless the party failing to timely respond to the discovery requests acted with substantial justification or the sanction would otherwise be unjust.  (Code Civ. Proc., ;; 2030.290(c), 2031.300(c).)  Although Defendant is entitled to sanctions, the Court finds Defendant’s request for sanctions to be excessive, given the motions are unopposed and virtually identical.  Therefore, the Court awards sanctions in a total amount of $882.50 (1-1/2 hour for preparing the motions at $175/hr, 2 hour for appearance time at $250/hr, plus $120.00 in filing fees).  Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s attorney of record are ordered to pay sanctions, jointly and severally, to Defendant, by and through counsel of record, in the total amount of $882.50 within twenty days.

Moving Party is ordered to give notice.

Moving Party is ordered to give notice.

 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANFF ROBERT ATLEE