This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 18:54:38 (UTC).

TCA GLOBAL CREDIT MASTER FUND, L.P. VS QUANTS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 TCA GLOBAL CREDIT MASTER FUND, L P filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against QUANTS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1013

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TCA GLOBAL CREDIT MASTER FUND L.P.

Defendants

QUANTSPLUS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

KISACIKOGLU GOKHAN

QUANTS CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN JEFFREY M

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) DENIED

7/2/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) DENIED

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/29/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/31/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Judgment

11/22/2019: Judgment

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

11/18/2019: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

11/22/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

10/22/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/20/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing

7/22/2019: Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing

Objection - OBJECTION TCA GLOBAL CREDIT MASTER FUND LP EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION

7/23/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TCA GLOBAL CREDIT MASTER FUND LP EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR GOKHAN KISACIKOGLU

7/23/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR GOKHAN KISACIKOGLU

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M JENSEN

7/23/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M JENSEN

Request for Judicial Notice

7/23/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS

8/7/2019: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) DENIED

8/12/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) DENIED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment); Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (DENIED); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketMotion to Vacate (Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment); Filed by Gokhan Kisacikoglu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT); Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT); Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT); Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TCA Global Credit Master Fund, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUANTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TCA Global Credit Master Fund, LP, is a litigant