This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2023 at 06:01:00 (UTC).

TAYLOR, JUDITH A. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 TAYLOR, JUDITH A - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SMALL, MICHAEL and UZCATEGUI, JESSICA A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4085

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SMALL, MICHAEL

UZCATEGUI, JESSICA A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TAYLOR TROY

Others and Not Classified By Court

BUNTING TRACY

RMO LLP

GEORGE WILLIAM A

Decedent

TAYLOR JUDITH A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DEMIRIS KONSTANTINE ANTONY

Other and Not Classified By Court Attorney

MUNTZ SEAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) HRG 9/1/21 - Probate Case Coversheet -Subsequent

7/9/2021: Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) HRG 9/1/21 - Probate Case Coversheet -Subsequent

Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

5/21/2021: Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

Minute Order

4/19/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/15/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing 4/19/2023

2/10/2023: Notice - Hearing 4/19/2023

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

2/3/2023: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Petition - Terminate Proceedings

2/3/2023: Petition - Terminate Proceedings

Minute Order

1/27/2023: Minute Order

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

11/30/2022: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Notice - Hearing

11/30/2022: Notice - Hearing

Status Report of Personal Representative Status Report of Administration

11/28/2022: Status Report of Personal Representative Status Report of Administration

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

11/28/2022: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Minute Order

11/18/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name

7/26/2022: Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

9/15/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Will Admitted

9/1/2021: Will Admitted

Minute Order

9/1/2021: Minute Order

Will in Safekeeping 52 pgs - Dated - 06/09/1983 - 21STSK01892

9/24/2020: Will in Safekeeping 52 pgs - Dated - 06/09/1983 - 21STSK01892

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/19/2023

Docketin Probate Department 5, Uzcategui, Jessica A., Presiding; Authority Hearing (Non-Trust) - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketPetition Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Heir

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

Docketin Probate Department 5, Uzcategui, Jessica A., Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Heir

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023

DocketNotice - Hearing (4/19/2023 ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023

DocketPetition - Terminate Proceedings; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
05/21/2021

DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2021

DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2021

DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2021

DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketPetition - Letters of Special Admin w/o Gen Powers (Initial); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2020

DocketWill in Safekeeping (CODICIL 7 pgs - Dated - 04/10/2010 - 21STSK01892 ); Filed by Depositor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2020

DocketWill in Safekeeping (52 pgs - Dated - 06/09/1983 - 21STSK01892 ); Filed by Depositor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less