Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 08:39:07 (UTC).

TAYLOR, JOHN ARTHUR - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 TAYLOR, JOHN ARTHUR - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2673

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TAYLOR MAURICE

Claimant

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Assignee

INHERITANCE FUNDING CO. INC

Decedent

TAYLOR JOHN ARTHUR

Not Classified By Court

GUTIERREZ RUBEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTIN THOMAS GLENN

Assignee Attorney

SCHROEDER STEVEN DALE

 

Court Documents

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

5/11/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Letters (Initial)

5/12/2021: Letters (Initial)

Creditor's Claim

4/29/2021: Creditor's Claim

Minute Order

4/29/2021: Minute Order

Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration

4/23/2021: Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

4/15/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

4/2/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Assignment - #1

4/1/2021: Assignment - #1

Request - Special Notice

4/1/2021: Request - Special Notice

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

3/30/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

3/22/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

3/22/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

3/22/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) filed on March 22, 2021 by Maurice Taylor. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSupplement (First Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssignment (#1 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INHERITANCE FUNDING CO. INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant