This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2022 at 00:13:15 (UTC).

TAUFI JOSE SANKI VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 TAUFI JOSE SANKI filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS, JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG, THOMAS D. LONG and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9040

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SANKI TAUFI JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 50

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ROSS STEVEN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LETICIA COTTI. DEPUTY CITY ATTY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED (MISSING DECLARATION CONCERNING WAIVED COURT FEES)

8/5/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED (MISSING DECLARATION CONCERNING WAIVED COURT FEES)

Request for Dismissal

10/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

2/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/10/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL) OF 04/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FRANCISCO MONTES ISO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTEROGS

11/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FRANCISCO MONTES ISO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTEROGS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FRANCISCO MONTES

11/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF FRANCISCO MONTES

Notice - NOTICE CITY MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

11/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE CITY MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES

Notice - NOTICE CITY MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE CITY MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

Notice of Motion

12/3/2019: Notice of Motion

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A SECOND PHYSICAL EXAMINATION; DECLARATION OF STEVEN ROSS

12/12/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A SECOND PHYSICAL EXAMINATION; DECLARATION OF STEVEN ROSS

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

12/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Reply - REPLY CITY REPLY TO OPP FOR ORDER COMPELLING PF TO SUBMIT TO A 2ND PHYSICAL EXAM

12/18/2019: Reply - REPLY CITY REPLY TO OPP FOR ORDER COMPELLING PF TO SUBMIT TO A 2ND PHYSICAL EXAM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO (CORRECTED) FIRST SU...)

12/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO (CORRECTED) FIRST SU...)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Taufi Jose Sanki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((Not Entered)); Filed by Taufi Jose Sanki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Not Entered (Missing Declaration Concerning Waived Court Fees)); Filed by Taufi Jose Sanki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Taufi Jose Sanki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Taufi Jose Sanki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURIES) 1. DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY (GOV'T CODE 835, ET. SEQ.);ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Taufi Jose Sanki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9040    Hearing Date: January 08, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TAUFI JOSE SANKI,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC699040

[TENTATIVE] ORDER TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 8, 2020

The Court continued the hearing on this motion to compel a second IME from 12/26/19 to 1/08/20.  The Court indicated the motion would be taken off calendar if Plaintiff attended the second IME on 12/27/19.  The Court is hopeful that Plaintiff attended the IME on 12/27/19, and the Court’s tentative ruling is to take the motion off calendar as moot.  If Plaintiff did not appear for the IME on 12/27/19, Counsel must appear at the hearing and be prepared to address the status of the IME and any issues relating to imposition of sanctions. 

Defendant is ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  


Case Number: ****9040    Hearing Date: December 26, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TAUFI JOSE SANKI,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC699040

[TENTATIVE] ORDER

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 26, 2019

1. Background Facts

Plaintiff, Taufi Jose Sanki filed this action against Defendant, City of Los Angeles for damages arising out of a motorcycle accident that occurred when Plaintiff’s motorcycle encountered a pothole on a city street.

2. Motion to Compel Second IME

Defendant filed and served this motion to compel a second IME on 12/03/19, setting it for hearing on 12/26/19. Plaintiff opposes the motion due to insufficient filing and service. Sixteen court days after 12/03/19 falls on 12/26/19, but Defendant failed to add five additional days due to the mail service of the moving papers. The motion is therefore improperly served per CCP ;1005(b), and is denied.

Notably, any reply to the opposition was due on or before 12/18/19. As of 12/20/19, the Court has not received any reply to the opposition, either online or in its courtesy copy box. The Court will not consider a late-filed reply.

3. Motions to Compel Responses to Discovery

Defendant propounded a Corrected First Supplemental Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents and Corrected First Supplemental Interrogatory on 5/30/19. To date, despite a meet and confer attempt, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendant therefore seeks to compel responses to the discovery and also seeks imposition of sanctions.

Notably, while Plaintiff did oppose the motion to compel a second IME, Plaintiff did not oppose these motions to compel. Defendant’s motions are granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to the outstanding discovery, without objections, within ten days. CCP ;;2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b).

Sanctions are mandatory. ;;2030.290(c), 2031.300(c). Defendant seeks sanctions in the amount of $800/motion. Defense Counsel values his service at the rate of $400/hour; the Court reduces this rate to $200/hour. The Court awards the requested one hour to prepare each motion to compel. The Court awards the requested one hour to appear, but only awards the time once. The Court awards a total of three hours of attorney time at the rate of $200/hour, for a total of $600 in attorneys’ fees.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiff and his attorney of record, jointly and severally; they are ordered to pay sanctions to Defendant, by and through counsel of record, in the total amount of $600, within twenty days.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.