This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 14:41:54 (UTC).

TATYANA TEAGUE, ET AL. VS VETS SECURING AMERICA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 TATYANA TEAGUE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VETS SECURING AMERICA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7495

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TEAGUE TATYANA

JOHNSON DOMINIQUE

Defendants

VETS SECURING AMERICA INC.

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVENPORT ASHLEY ALLISON

Defendant Attorneys

XULI DANIEL

ANDERSON WILLIAM GEOFFREY

FISHER VINCENT REGIS

GATLEY STEVEN GEOFFREY

QUALLS DANIEL HARVEY

SPADA KRISTEN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Joint Status Conference Report

11/29/2021: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

12/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

2/3/2022: Request for Dismissal

Order - ORDER DISMISSING CLASS ACTION WITHOUT HEARING

2/8/2022: Order - ORDER DISMISSING CLASS ACTION WITHOUT HEARING

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

9/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

8/30/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

8/30/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice - DEFENDANTS VETS SECURING AMERICA, INC. AND AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

6/23/2021: Notice - DEFENDANTS VETS SECURING AMERICA, INC. AND AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

6/28/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE;)

7/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

7/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Answer - DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/16/2021: Answer - DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

3/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Appearance

3/15/2021: Notice of Appearance

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

3/16/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Class Action Without Hearing; Filed by Tatyana Teague (Plaintiff); Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tatyana Teague (Plaintiff); Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Status Conference); Filed by Tatyana Teague (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by Vets Securing America, Inc. (Defendant); American Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Status Conference); Filed by Tatyana Teague (Plaintiff); Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Tatyana Teague (Plaintiff); Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Tatyana Teague (Plaintiff); Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 2:38 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/11/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tatyana Teague (Plaintiff); Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tatyana Teague (Plaintiff); Dominique Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VETS SECURING AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPADA KRISTEN E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anderson, William Geoffrey