This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 03:34:14 (UTC).

TATYANA SHEVTSOV VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by TATYANA SHEVTSOV against CITY OF LOS ANGELES in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4053

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEVSOV TATYANA

Respondents and Defendants

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

RALPHS GROVERY COMPANY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/26/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

4/26/2018: Unknown

SUMMONS

4/26/2018: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Tatyana Shevsov (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Request-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704053    Hearing Date: February 06, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

tatyana shevtsov,

Plaintiff,

v.

city of los angeles, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC704053

Hearing Date: February 6, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

plaintiff’s motion to set aside dismissal

Plaintiff Tatyana Shevtsov (“Plaintiff”) moves to set aside the Court’s order of October 28, 2019, in which the Court dismissed this action for failure to appear at trial. Plaintiff moves to set aside the dismissal per Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (d), which permits the Court to set aside void judgments. Plaintiff contends the dismissal was void, because the Court dismissed the action per Code of Civil Procedure section 583, subdivision (b)(3), which does not exist. This is a typographical error. The dismissal was per Code of Civil Procedure section 581, subdivision (b)(3), which permits the court to dismiss an action for failure to appear at trial. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 581, subd. (b)(3). A judgment that results from judicial error is not void. (See Johnson v. E-Z Ins. Brokerage, Inc. (2009) 175 Cal.App.4th 86, 99.) Accordingly, this is not a basis to set aside the dismissal under Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (d).

Plaintiff further argues that the dismissal is void because the trial date was set for October 26, 2018, which is a Saturday, not October 28, 2019, when Plaintiff failed to appear. Plaintiff advances no evidence in support of this argument, which fails as unsupported. Likewise, Plaintiff’s argument that Plaintiff did not have notice of the October 28, 2019 hearing is unsupported.

Plaintiff argues that the Court’s order of October 28, 2019 is void because Judge Laura A. Siegle presided over the October 28, 2019 hearing, when the case was initially before Judge Yolanda Orozco. That is immaterial. “The cause is before the court, not the individual judge of that court . . . .” (People v. Osslo (1958) 50 Cal.2d 75, 104.) Regardless, Judge Orozco was transferred to a different assignment, and Judge Siegle was assigned in her place.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Plaintiff’s motion is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff contends the dismissal was the result of her “mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect . . . ,” Plaintiff may seek relief under Code of Civil Procedure, section 473, subdivision (b). The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.

DATED: February 6, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court