This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 02:36:27 (UTC).

TATIANNA S STRATTON ET AL VSLIONEL ROBERT

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 TATIANNA S STRATTON VSLIONEL ROBERT was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3924

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

STRATTON JULIETTE G.

STRATTON TATIANNA S.

STARTTON WINIFRED J.

STRATTON SHEILA

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

ROBERT LIONEL J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAHBAZ JACOB A. ESQ.

SHAHBAZ JACOB ARASH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/7/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

6/7/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketOrder (Granting Motion to Vacate Dismissal); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by TATIANNA S. STRATTON (Plaintiff); SHEILA STRATTON (Plaintiff); JULIETTE G. STRATTON (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by TATIANNA S. STRATTON (Plaintiff); SHEILA STRATTON (Plaintiff); JULIETTE G. STRATTON (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Serve Summons and Complaint/Proof of Service /Proof of Publication) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Serve Summon...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Serve Summon...) of 03/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TATIANNA S. STRATTON (Plaintiff); SHEILA STRATTON (Plaintiff); JULIETTE G. STRATTON (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3924    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TATIANNA S. STRATTON, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LIONEL ROBERT, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****3924

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 14, 2020

The Court previously granted Plaintiffs’ attorney’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff, Juliette Stratton. At this time, Counsel seeks to be relieved from representation of Tatiana, Sheila, and Winifred Stratton. Counsel declares he served the motions on Plaintiffs by personal service, and has filed proof of service on Plaintiffs by personal service. The proof of service, however, indicates Plaintiffs were personally served on 1/04/20, only six court days prior to the hearing. This is insufficient per CCP ;1005(b), and therefore the motions are denied without prejudice.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.



Case Number: ****3924    Hearing Date: November 06, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TATIANNA S. STRATTON, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LIONEL ROBERT, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****3924

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 6, 2019

The Court previously granted Plaintiffs’ attorney’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff, Juliette Stratton.  At this time, Counsel seeks to be relieved from representation of Tatiaana, Sheila, and Winifred Stratton.  The motions are denied.  Counsel declares he served the motions on Plaintiffs at a confirmed address, but does not state how he confirmed the address.  Indeed, he then goes on to declare the Court should grant the motions even though the address is not confirmed, but his reasons relate to representation difficulties, not to service. 

If Counsel has confirmed Plaintiffs’ addresses, he must submit a declaration stating how the addresses were confirmed.  If Counsel has not confirmed Plaintiffs’ addresses, he must submit a declaration including details concerning his attempts to confirm their addresses.  Additionally, if Counsel does not confirm Plaintiffs’ addresses, he must file proof of service of the moving papers on the Clerk of the Court pursuant to CCP ;1101(b) and CRC 3.1362(d). 

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAHBAZ JACOB A