This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2023 at 00:01:16 (UTC).

TATIANA TRASHANDA TATUM VS EDWIN PARTIAI

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 TATIANA TRASHANDA TATUM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDWIN PARTIAI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6756

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TATUM TATIANA TRASHANDA

Defendant

PARTIAI EDWIN

Not Classified By Court

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLASS JAKE

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SOLEIMANPOUR MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/24/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/24/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/24/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/24/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/24/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/24/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/24/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Lien

4/28/2023: Notice of Lien

 

Docket Entries

05/04/2023

DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 05/04/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by: TATIANA TRASHANDA TATUM (Plaintiff); Westlake Services LLC (Non-Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by TATIANA TRASHANDA TATUM on 02/24/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by TATIANA TRASHANDA TATUM as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: TATIANA TRASHANDA TATUM (Plaintiff); As to: EDWIN PARTIAI (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: TATIANA TRASHANDA TATUM (Plaintiff); As to: EDWIN PARTIAI (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
02/24/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TATIANA TRASHANDA TATUM (Plaintiff); As to: EDWIN PARTIAI (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TATIANA TRASHANDA TATUM (Plaintiff); As to: EDWIN PARTIAI (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less