This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/31/2019 at 07:34:57 (UTC).

TATIANA SOLOMON ET AL VS 404 N MAPLE DR LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2017 TATIANA SOLOMON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 404 N MAPLE DR LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4588

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

SOLOMON TATIANA

SOLOMON NORMAN

VOZNIOUK TATIANA

SOLOMON TATIANA AKA TATIANA VOZNIOUK

SOLOMON

L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC

PITTMAN ADRA L.

WILCOX WIL S.

Plaintiff and Appellant

SOLOMON TATIANA AKA TATIANA VOZNIOUK

Defendants and Respondents

404 N. MAPLE DR. LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

FRESHMAN SAMUEL

STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SIMONIAN & SIMONIAN PLC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR & STEWART LLP

STELLWAGEN ROBERT HARWOOD JR

 

Court Documents

SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT (1) NEGLIGENCE ETC....

6/18/2018: SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT (1) NEGLIGENCE ETC....

Notice of Ruling

10/24/2019: Notice of Ruling

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE

10/15/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED HEARING PENDING APPEAL

10/17/2019: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED HEARING PENDING APPEAL

Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SUMMARY JUDJMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF; EXHIBITS

10/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SUMMARY JUDJMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF; EXHIBITS

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF, EXHIBITS

10/22/2019: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF, EXHIBITS

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/22/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)

10/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)

Response - RESPONSE SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED HEARING PENDING APPEAL

10/7/2019: Response - RESPONSE SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUED HEARING PENDING APPEAL

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

6/11/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

6/21/2019: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

6/21/2019: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT B297996 NOA 5/20/19

7/25/2019: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT B297996 NOA 5/20/19

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM PLAINTIFF

8/8/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM PLAINTIFF

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

8/15/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)

8/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)

Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

8/15/2019: Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

Notice of Ruling

8/16/2019: Notice of Ruling

122 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • Hearing12/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by 404 N. Maple Dr., LLC (Defendant); Standard Management Company (Defendant); Samuel Freshman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 5/20/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by 404 N. Maple Dr., LLC (Defendant); Standard Management Company (Defendant); Samuel Freshman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion For Reconsideration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of Plaintiff, Exhibits; Filed by Tatiana Solomon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion For Reconsideration of Summary Judjment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Plaintiff; Exhibits; Filed by Tatiana Solomon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketReply ( Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Recover Attorneys' Fees and Request for Continued Hearing Pending Appeal); Filed by Standard Management Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
215 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Tatiana Solomon (Plaintiff); Tatiana Vozniouk (Legacy Party); Norman Solomon [dism] (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Tatiana Solomon (Plaintiff); Norman Solomon [dism] (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGIMNT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tatiana Solomon (Plaintiff); Norman Solomon [dism] (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Docket(1) NEGLIGENCE (2) NEGLIGENCE PER SE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLOMON AKA DONALD RAY SOLOMON AKA DON R, DONALD R. is a litigant

Latest cases where STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC. is a litigant