This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2022 at 15:45:24 (UTC).

TASHEKA ENGLISH VS CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 TASHEKA ENGLISH filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7648

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENGLISH TASHEKA

Defendants

CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARR MIKE T.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/1/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/9/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tasheka English (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant); Service Date: 12/05/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tasheka English (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant); Service Date: 12/05/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tasheka English (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tasheka English (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tasheka English (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tasheka English (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David Sotelo in Department 40 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARR MIKE T.