This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2022 at 11:58:02 (UTC).

TARIKA TENASHA REED VS WASTE MANAGEMENT INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 TARIKA TENASHA REED filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WASTE MANAGEMENT INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0682

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REED TARIKA TENASHA

Defendants

LOPEZ GERARDO

WASTE MANAGEMENT CA INC.

WASTE MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANESHRAD SHARI SHARAREH

KOTTLER DOUGLAS E.

Defendant Attorney

BORDIN-WOSK JOSHUA D

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/7/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

10/24/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2025
  • Hearing09/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2023
  • Hearing11/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2023
  • Hearing11/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tarika Tenasha Reed (Plaintiff); As to: Waste Management Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/10/2022; Service Cost: 81.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tarika Tenasha Reed (Plaintiff); As to: Gerardo Lopez (Defendant); Service Date: 10/18/2022; Service Cost: 94.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tarika Tenasha Reed (Plaintiff); As to: Waste Management CA Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/10/2022; Service Cost: 61.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Final Status Conference scheduled for 11/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 11/01/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Waste Management CA Inc. (Defendant); Gerardo Lopez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tarika Tenasha Reed (Plaintiff); As to: Waste Management Inc. (Defendant); Waste Management CA Inc. (Defendant); Gerardo Lopez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/08/2025 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tarika Tenasha Reed (Plaintiff); As to: Waste Management Inc. (Defendant); Waste Management CA Inc. (Defendant); Gerardo Lopez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tarika Tenasha Reed (Plaintiff); As to: Waste Management Inc. (Defendant); Waste Management CA Inc. (Defendant); Gerardo Lopez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen Morgan in Department A14 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/17/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANESHRAD SHARI SHARAREH