This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2019 at 01:21:19 (UTC).

TARIK DUGUM VS IDRIP VAPE, LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 TARIK DUGUM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IDRIP VAPE, LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8440

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUGUM TARIK

Defendants

IDRIP VAPE LLC

RIHANI EYAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARJIYA LAW OFFICE

Defendant Attorney

MEAGLIA RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/13/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

8/2/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/31/2018: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/27/2018: Answer

Answer

7/27/2018: Answer

Minute Order

7/9/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

6/18/2018: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/29/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/29/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice

4/16/2018: Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/16/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Legacy Document

4/11/2018: Legacy Document

Summons

4/11/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by TARIK DUGUM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by TARIK DUGUM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Answer; Filed by EYAD RIHANI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Answer; Filed by IDRIP VAPE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department F47; (Order ReRelated Cases; Case Reassigned for all purposes) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by TARIK DUGUM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by TARIK DUGUM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by TARIK DUGUM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Notice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TARIK DUGUM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where iDrip Vape, LLC. is a litigant