This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2020 at 11:17:02 (UTC).

TARGET CORPORATION VS BOB ANDERSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 TARGET CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against BOB ANDERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0207

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TARGET CORPORATION

Defendants

PIERCE HERB

BURKE RYAN

TOBAR VICTORIA

ANDERSON BOB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDOWELL DAVID FRANK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/16/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/12/2020

5/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/12/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

8/25/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action); Filed by Target Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docketat 2:27 PM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/12/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Target Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Target Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Target Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDOWELL, DAVID F