This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2020 at 03:57:23 (UTC).

TAPIA, TAMMY VS WILEY, ROBERT, II

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 TAPIA, TAMMY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WILEY, ROBERT, II. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA and HADNOT PRIOLEAU, LATONYA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0243

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

HADNOT PRIOLEAU, LATONYA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TAPIA TAMMY

Respondents

WILEY ROBERT

WILEY ROBERT II

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partially granted

2/11/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partially granted

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/11/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/11/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Partially granted

2/11/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Partially granted

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

2/11/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/27/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

2/27/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/9/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

3/9/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/30/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

3/30/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/24/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

4/24/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

4/24/2020: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • Hearing06/22/2020 at 8:30 AM in Department N at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, Hadnot Prioleau, LaTonya, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Partially granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Partially granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.