This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 11:54:08 (UTC).

TANYA HAJJ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 TANYA HAJJ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0053

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAJJ AN INDIVIDUAL TANYA

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOUKASIAN ALISA

Defendant Attorney

PROUDFOOT MATTHEW M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/11/2023: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/12/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

2/16/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

2/16/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ford Motor Company, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); As to: Tanya Hajj, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Ford Motor Company, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Tanya Hajj, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 01/17/2023; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tanya Hajj, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tanya Hajj, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tanya Hajj, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tanya Hajj, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less