Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 02:40:22 (UTC).

TANOS NALBANDIAN VS JORDAN'S RESTORATION SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 TANOS NALBANDIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JORDAN'S RESTORATION SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5689

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NALBANDIAN TANOS

Defendant

JORDAN'S RESTORATION SERVICES INC. DBA SERVPRO OF PARK LA BREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEWSON NEIL

Defendant Attorney

CREED JOSEPH W

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

6/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

6/30/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2021

4/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/16/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • Hearing07/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Hearing07/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jordan's Restoration Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jordan's Restoration Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Tanos Nalbandian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 11:29 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tanos Nalbandian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tanos Nalbandian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tanos Nalbandian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JORDAN'S RESTORATION SERVICES INC AKA SERVPRO OF PARK LA BREA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CREED JOSEPH W.