This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2021 at 12:02:49 (UTC).

TANG , WAI SUM - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 TANG , WAI SUM - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4116

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KWAN TAMMY SHUK KUEN

Decedent

TANG WAI SUM

Not Classified By Court

ANSON BRIAN W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TRAN HUNG BAN

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140)

4/28/2021: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140)

Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00) - Ex Parte - Petition for Special Letters

4/28/2021: Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00) - Ex Parte - Petition for Special Letters

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application for Granting Appointment of Special Administrator

4/28/2021: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application for Granting Appointment of Special Administrator

Ex Parte - Order

4/30/2021: Ex Parte - Order

Ex Parte - Order

4/30/2021: Ex Parte - Order

Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent) - Petition for Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

5/19/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent) - Petition for Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

Bond

7/13/2021: Bond

Letters (Initial)

7/13/2021: Letters (Initial)

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

7/7/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

7/1/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Minute Order

6/22/2021: Minute Order

Supplement - First Supplement

6/16/2021: Supplement - First Supplement

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

6/11/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

5/25/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • Hearing11/22/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketBond; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent) filed on May 19, 2021 by Tammy Shuk Kuen Kwan . )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSupplement (First Supplement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent) (Petition for Letters of Administration (Subsequent) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (Ex Parte Application for Granting Appointment of Special Administrator ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition ($200.00) (Ex Parte - Petition for Special Letters ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN HUNG BAN