This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 07:53:28 (UTC).

TANECQUE GILBERT VS CITY OF CARSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/31/2017 TANECQUE GILBERT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF CARSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1609

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GILBERT TANECQUE

Defendants and Respondents

TUNER WILLIAM O.

DOES 1 TO 30

TURNER JUANITA G.

CARSON CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ELLIS LAW CORPORATION

Defendant Attorney

SOLTANI SUNNY K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

12/24/2018: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

2/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

CITY OF CARSON'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/22/2017: CITY OF CARSON'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CITY OF CARSON'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/22/2017: CITY OF CARSON'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

10/31/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT?PERSONAL I?JURY,PROPERTY DAMAGE WRONGFUL DEATH

10/31/2017: COMPLAINT?PERSONAL I?JURY,PROPERTY DAMAGE WRONGFUL DEATH

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Tanecque Gilbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Notice of Settlement of Entire Case; Filed by Tanecque Gilbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • CITY OF CARSON'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • CITY OF CARSON'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Carson, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Carson, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Carson, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT PERSONAL I JURY,PROPERTY DAMAGE WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Tanecque Gilbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARSON CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLTANI SUNNY K.