This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 21:47:42 (UTC).

TAN, TINEKE GIOK-TIEN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 TAN, TINEKE GIOK-TIEN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MATCHAM, SUSAN J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2046

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MATCHAM, SUSAN J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TAN JACK SIN-GIE

Decedent

TAN TINEKE GIOK-TIEN

Not Classified By Court

MAINSTAIN MORRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEHN RICHARD ANTON

 

Court Documents

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

1/4/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Supplement - Supplement to petition for probate of will and for letters

1/5/2022: Supplement - Supplement to petition for probate of will and for letters

Will Deposited - 2 pgs - Dated - 07/22/1997

12/29/2021: Will Deposited - 2 pgs - Dated - 07/22/1997

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

12/21/2021: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

Minute Order

1/27/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

1/20/2022: Proof of Publication

Letters (Initial)

2/16/2022: Letters (Initial)

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

2/7/2022: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

1/31/2022: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Will - Admitted

1/27/2022: Will - Admitted

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • Hearing06/28/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Matcham, Susan J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to petition for probate of will and for letters ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketWill Deposited (2 pgs - Dated - 07/22/1997 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHN RICHARD ANTON