This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2020 at 15:21:38 (UTC).

TAMMY ROUSSIN VS NBC UNIVERSAL FOUNDATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 TAMMY ROUSSIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NBC UNIVERSAL FOUNDATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN, LAURA A. MATZ, C. EDWARD SIMPSON and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4913

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

LAURA A. MATZ

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ROUSSIN TAMMY

Respondents and Defendants

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS LLP

UNIVERSAL CITY WALK

NBC UNIVERSAL FOUNDATION

NBC UNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC

NBC UNIVERSAL THEME PARKS

DOES 1 TO 50

NBC UNIVERSAL INC

NBS UNIVERSAL LLC

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS LLLP

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS LLC

NBC UNIVERSAL LLC

UNIVERSAL CITYWALK

NBC UNIVERSAL INC.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

AGHAKHANI ARSINEH ESQ.

AGHAKHANI LAW

LAW AGHAKHANI

AGHAKHANI ARSINEH

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

SCHRIEFFER PAUL K. ESQ.

P.K. SCHRIEFFER LLP

SCHRIEFFER PAUL KARSTEN

HUEZO CELIM EDUARDO ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A TRIAL CONTINUANCE

3/27/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/27/2020

3/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/27/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Settlement

5/6/2020: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

6/25/2020: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A TRIAL CONTINUANCE

12/23/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/23/2019

12/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/23/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

12/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

12/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

9/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARSINEH AGHAKHANI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

8/23/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARSINEH AGHAKHANI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Separate Statement

8/23/2019: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STA

8/23/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STA

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/26/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Judicial Notice

8/29/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF MARK J BURNS

8/29/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF MARK J BURNS

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Jury Trial ((5-7 day estimate)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by TAMMY ROUSSIN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by TAMMY ROUSSIN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Jury Trial ((5-7 day estimate)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TAMMY ROUSSIN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL CITYWALK is a litigant

Latest cases where NBC UNIVERSAL FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL STUDIOS LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NBC UNIVERSAL THEME PARK is a litigant