Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 00:36:09 (UTC).

TAMMY HARPER VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 TAMMY HARPER filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1423

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARPER TAMMY

Defendants

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY INC.

THE VONS COMPANIES INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

SAFEWAY INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. FKA JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON MARK PARKER JR

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF COMPLAINTS FILED IN POTENTIAL ADD-ON CASES

4/16/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF COMPLAINTS FILED IN POTENTIAL ADD-ON CASES

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF POTENTIAL ADD-ON CASES FOR COORDINATION OF THIS CASE INTO JCCP 4872

4/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF POTENTIAL ADD-ON CASES FOR COORDINATION OF THIS CASE INTO JCCP 4872

Order - ORDER RE: COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

4/26/2021: Order - ORDER RE: COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

5/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

5/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 04/06/2021

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 04/06/2021

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/23/2021: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of Court Order Re Coordination Of Add-On Cases); Filed by Tammy Harper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order Re Coordination of Add-On Cases); Filed by Tammy Harper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketOrder (Re: Coordination of Add-On Cases)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Submission of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination of This Case Into JCCP 4872); Filed by Tammy Harper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Tammy Harper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Tammy Harper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Tammy Harper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Tammy Harper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Tammy Harper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 2:19 PM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 04/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tammy Harper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tammy Harper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE VONS COMPANIES INC DBA PAVILIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant