This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2021 at 01:21:36 (UTC).

TAMEKA SMILEY VS FIRST TO SERVE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 TAMEKA SMILEY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FIRST TO SERVE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8630

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMILEY TAMEKA

Defendant

FIRST TO SERVE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUM MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

7/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With prejudice, Complaint, Entire Action); Filed by Tameka Smiley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tameka Smiley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tameka Smiley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tameka Smiley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First to Serve, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUM MATTHEW