This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 08:11:06 (UTC).

TAMARA WENGUER VS MARTA CHRISTINE NASON

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 TAMARA WENGUER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTA CHRISTINE NASON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7971

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant

WENGUER TAMARA

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

NASON MARTA CHRISTINE

CANCER SUPPORT COMMUNITY VALLEY/VENTURA/SANTA BARBARA INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CANCER SUPPORT COMMUNITY VALLEY/VENTURA/SANTA BARBARA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SOMMER AND BEAR

SOMMER PAUL ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

JEDRZEJEK MATT ESQ.

LEE TED M.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

9/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

SUMMONS

9/29/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice

5/16/2019: Notice

Minute Order

4/26/2019: Minute Order

Motion to Continue Trial Date

3/22/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Summons

3/14/2019: Summons

Demand for Jury Trial

3/14/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

3/14/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/14/2019: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

12/19/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

12/18/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Notice

12/10/2018: Notice

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/13/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Other -

9/12/2018: Other -

Answer

9/12/2018: Answer

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Ruling RE Defendant Cancer Support Community Valley/Ventura/Santa Barbara, Inc.'s Motion to Continue July Trial and All Related Deadlines); Filed by Cancer Support Community Valley/Ventura/Santa Barbara, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial (July 15, 2019 Trial and all Related Deadlines) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Defendant/Cross-Complainant Cancer Support Community Valley/V...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by Cancer Support Community Valley/Ventura/Santa Barbara, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Cancer Support Community Valley/Ventura/Santa Barbara, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cancer Support Community Valley/Ventura/Santa Barbara, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Cancer Support Community Valley/Ventura/Santa Barbara, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer (by Cancer Support Community Valley/Ventura/Santa Barbara, Inc( sued herein as "Doe 1") to Complaint); Filed by Cancer Support Community Valley/Ventura/Santa Barbara, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Tamara Wenguer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Marta Christine Nason (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Marta Christine Nason (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Tamara Wenguer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tamara Wenguer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7971    Hearing Date: March 10, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion for Summary Judgment 

Defendant and Cross-Complainant Cancer Support Community Valley/Ventura/Santa Barbara, Inc. (“CSCVVSB”)’s motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative summary adjudication as to the entirety of Plaintiff’s complaint is placed OFF CALENDAR as moot. On January 22, 2020, Plaintiff dismissed the complaint as to Defendant CSCVVSB without prejudice. Accordingly, Plaintiff’s dismissal renders the instant motion moot. 

The moving party is ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such. 



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEDRZEJEK MATT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE TED M. ESQ.