This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:18:35 (UTC).

TALIA SLONE VS VETS SECURING AMERICA INC

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 TALIA SLONE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VETS SECURING AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7379

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SLONE TALIA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

VETS SECURING AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

OTKUPMAN LAW FIRM ALC

MAERTZ MEGHAN SHERRY

MAERTZ MEGHAN SHERRY ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BRADLEY BARRY A. ESQ.

BRADLEY BARRY ALAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

8/9/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/9/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

8/9/2018: REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/23/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE

9/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFENDANT VETS SECURING AMERICA, INC.'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

9/28/2018: DEFENDANT VETS SECURING AMERICA, INC.'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/28/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/28/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Case Management Statement

11/29/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/27/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

12/4/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order

12/4/2018: Minute Order

Request

12/4/2018: Request

Certificate of Mailing for

12/4/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

10/11/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

10/9/2018: Case Management Statement

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 12/04/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Request (for Dismissal; [Declaration of Roman Otkupkman in Support Thereon]; Order Thereon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Vets Securing America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Talia Slone (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Vets Securing America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Vets Securing America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Talia Slone (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Talia Slone (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VETS SECURING AMERICA INC. is a litigant