Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2020 at 15:00:53 (UTC).

TALI PYKE VS JOHANA FERNANDEZ-SANCHEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 TALI PYKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOHANA FERNANDEZ-SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3900

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PYKE TALI

Defendants

FERNANDEZ-SANCHEZ JOHANA

FLORES GARCIA ANDRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOURMAND JOSEPH S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/4/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

7/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/27/2020

7/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/27/2020

Notice of Settlement

7/27/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

6/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/30/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/24/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tali Pyke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 3:55 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement) of 07/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Tali Pyke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tali Pyke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tali Pyke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tali Pyke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less