Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 07:40:01 (UTC).

TALGO, INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION VS SEMA SAFETY SRL, AN ITALIAN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 TALGO, INC , A WASHINGTON CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SEMA SAFETY SRL, AN ITALIAN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3735

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TALGO INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

Defendant

SEMA SAFETY SRL AN ITALIAN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SIPPRELLE KEITH

SIPPRELLE KEITH ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • Hearing06/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TALGO, INC., a Washington corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TALGO, INC., a Washington corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TALGO, INC., a Washington corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TALGO, INC., a Washington corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPPRELLE, KEITH A