This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 10:13:58 (UTC).

TALAMANTE, LILLIAN DOMINGUEZ - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 TALAMANTE, LILLIAN DOMINGUEZ - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSS, EDWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8315

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSS, EDWARD M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TREBAOL JOHN

Assignees

INHERITANCE FUNDING CO. INC

PROBATE ADVANCE LLC

Decedent

TALAMANTE LILLIAN DOMINGUEZ

Not Classified By Court

FINCH MARY ARLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GOULD RODNEY THOMAS

Assignee Attorney

SCHROEDER STEVEN DALE

 

Court Documents

Notice - Death - -To The Department Of Health Care Services

12/14/2021: Notice - Death - -To The Department Of Health Care Services

Notice - Death - -To California Franchise Tax Board

12/14/2021: Notice - Death - -To California Franchise Tax Board

Notice - Death - -To Public Entities

12/14/2021: Notice - Death - -To Public Entities

Assignment - Assignment #2

11/2/2021: Assignment - Assignment #2

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

11/10/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Letters (Initial)

11/15/2021: Letters (Initial)

Bond - suretec

11/15/2021: Bond - suretec

Assignment

12/1/2021: Assignment

Minute Order

10/4/2021: Minute Order

Request - Special Notice - Request for Special Notice

10/6/2021: Request - Special Notice - Request for Special Notice

Notice - Notice of Assignment

10/6/2021: Notice - Notice of Assignment

Request - Special Notice

9/17/2021: Request - Special Notice

Assignment

9/17/2021: Assignment

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver

9/23/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

9/28/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

9/28/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

8/25/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

8/25/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • Hearing03/06/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Death (-To California Franchise Tax Board ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Death (-To The Department Of Health Care Services ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Death (-To Public Entities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAssignment; Filed by Assignee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketBond (suretec ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketAssignment (Assignment #2 ); Filed by Assignee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (Request for Special Notice ); Filed by Assignee

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssignment; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROBATE ADVANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INHERITANCE FUNDING CO. INC is a litigant