This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 15:47:15 (UTC).

TAL TZAFRIR, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS CHEN TAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 TAL TZAFRIR, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHEN TAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9301

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TZAFRIR AN INDIVIDUAL MORAN

TZAFRIR AN INDIVIDUAL TAL

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF MALIBU

TAN CHEN

ALCORN FENCE COMPANY

NORTHWEST EXCAVATING INC.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUNO KEITH J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GUTERRES TOMAS ANTONIO

AGUILERA ABEL ERIC

DOUGLASS MICHAEL C.

ANIELSKI JEFFREY M.

D'ORO FRANK J.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUGLASS MICHAEL C.

ANIELSKI JEFFREY M.

PIERCE JONYSON A

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

8/25/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

8/27/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Mail

6/1/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/17/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/29/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

5/26/2021: Answer

Answer

5/17/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

5/3/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/27/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/19/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/23/2021: PI General Order

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2024
  • Hearing03/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • Hearing08/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by ALCORN FENCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by ALCORN FENCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by CITY OF MALIBU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by NORTHWEST EXCAVATING, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by NORTHWEST EXCAVATING, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by CITY OF MALIBU (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by CITY OF MALIBU (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TAL TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff); MORAN TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by TAL TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TAL TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by TAL TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TAL TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff); MORAN TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TAL TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff); MORAN TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TAL TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff); MORAN TZAFRIR, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHWEST EXCAVATING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alcorn Fence Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF MALIBU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUNO, KEITH