This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 15:39:46 (UTC).

TAE KANG VS PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 TAE KANG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1463

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANG TAE

Defendant

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TASHJIAN ARMEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/25/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/24/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/20/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

11/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2024
  • Hearing08/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • Hearing02/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tae Kang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tae Kang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tae Kang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tae Kang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TASHJIAN ARMEN MICHAEL