This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 11:12:41 (UTC).

TABAZ, CYRUS - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 TABAZ, CYRUS - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0764

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TABAZ ATIDZE

Claimants

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Respondent

TAHBAZ BEHROUZ

Assignee

INHERITANCE ADVANCED LLC

Decedent

TABAZ CYRUS

Others

STEWIG ZIBA

TAHBAZ KAMBIS

TAHBAZ PIROUZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LUDWIG MITCHELL BRIAN

Respondent Attorney

STERN MARC MARTIN

Other Attorney

MORRIS JAMES GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

11/8/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Substitution of Attorney

12/29/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing (Notices)

10/14/2022: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing (Notices)

Minute Order

9/19/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/19/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing (Notices)

9/27/2022: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing (Notices)

Response - Atidze Tabaz's Responses to RPD, Set ONE, Propounded by Ziba Stewig (Responses)

8/26/2022: Response - Atidze Tabaz's Responses to RPD, Set ONE, Propounded by Ziba Stewig (Responses)

Response - Atidze Tabaz's Responses to SROG, Set ONE, Propounded by Ziba Stewig (Responses)

8/26/2022: Response - Atidze Tabaz's Responses to SROG, Set ONE, Propounded by Ziba Stewig (Responses)

Assignment - ATIDZE TABAZ ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANVE ADVANCED

9/15/2022: Assignment - ATIDZE TABAZ ASSIGNMENT 1 TO INHERITANVE ADVANCED

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

11/8/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Minute Order

5/13/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/13/2022: Minute Order

Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - Petition Confirming Estate Interest

4/15/2022: Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - Petition Confirming Estate Interest

Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - to Spousal Property Petition

4/15/2022: Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - to Spousal Property Petition

Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - to Petition for Court Order Confirming the Estate's Interest in 100% of Decedent's Trust Assets

4/18/2022: Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - to Petition for Court Order Confirming the Estate's Interest in 100% of Decedent's Trust Assets

Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - to Spousal Property Petition

4/18/2022: Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - to Spousal Property Petition

Creditor's Claim

4/11/2022: Creditor's Claim

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing (Notices)

4/4/2022: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing (Notices)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • Hearing02/10/2023 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Spousal Property Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • Hearing02/10/2023 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Probate Code 850 Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNotice - Ruling (Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice - Ruling (Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Spousal Property Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition for Letters of Administration filed on 11/8/2021 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSupplement (to Petition for Letters ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INHERITANCE ADVANCED LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERN MARC MARTIN