This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2022 at 14:10:53 (UTC).

T. S. VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 T S filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8112

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S. T.

Defendants

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

SAN FERNANDO/SYLMAR COMMUNITY OF SCHOOLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA GREGORY A.

Defendant Attorney

BARATTA JAMES M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/2/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/2/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/2/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

6/2/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/2/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/6/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

6/6/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/27/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2024
  • Hearing05/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2023
  • Hearing11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2023
  • Hearing11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant); SAN FERNANDO/SYLMAR COMMUNITY OF SCHOOLS (Defendant); As to: T. S. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant); SAN FERNANDO/SYLMAR COMMUNITY OF SCHOOLS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: T. S. (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant); Service Date: 06/22/2022; Service Cost: 127.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: T. S. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by: T. S. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: T. S. (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant); SAN FERNANDO/SYLMAR COMMUNITY OF SCHOOLS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: T. S. (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant); SAN FERNANDO/SYLMAR COMMUNITY OF SCHOOLS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garcia, Gregory A