This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 14:44:43 (UTC).

T PERLA VS ALL COUNTIES COURIER INC

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 T PERLA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALL COUNTIES COURIER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9555

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PERLA T.

Respondents and Defendants

ALL COUNTIES COURIER INCORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 10

ALL COUNTIES COURIER INC.

DOE ONE THROUGH AND INCLUDING DOE TEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HARRIS ALAN ESQ.

MOHAN PRIYA

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

RUMM JAMES F.

 

Court Documents

Other -

2/15/2018: Other -

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

5/31/2018: Declaration

Other -

6/6/2018: Other -

Notice of Settlement

6/25/2018: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

9/27/2018: Minute Order

Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

10/11/2018: Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

Declaration

10/11/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

12/10/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

12/11/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

12/12/2018: Minute Order

Order

12/12/2018: Order

Other -

1/12/2018: Other -

Minute Order

11/17/2017: Minute Order

Response

11/13/2017: Response

Stipulation

10/5/2017: Stipulation

Notice of Appearance

10/27/2017: Notice of Appearance

Summons

9/22/2017: Summons

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Order (Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Approval of settlement); Filed by T. Perla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Supplemental Declaration of Alan Harris; Filed by T. Perla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • at 1:46 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Settlement; Filed by T. Perla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by T. Perla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 322; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-09-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Order INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by T. Perla (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • COMPLAINT [PAGA REPRESENTATIVE. LAW ENFORCEMENT ACTION; CLASS ACTION] I. SECTIONS 510 AND 1194 OFTHE CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE, FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME AND MINIMUM WAGE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL COUNTIES COURIER INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUMM JAMES