This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2022 at 04:35:57 (UTC).

SZIKSZOY, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 SZIKSZOY, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5172

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SZIKSZOY VERONICA LYNN

Decedent

SZIKSZOY CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH

Not Classified By Court

BUA JOSEPH D SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOWNE ROBERT RALPH II

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

5/24/2022: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

5/31/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication

6/6/2022: Proof of Publication

Minute Order

7/8/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement in Response to Probate Notes

7/5/2022: Supplement - Supplement in Response to Probate Notes

Assignment - Assignment of Beneficial Interest to Veronica Lynn Szikszoy

8/4/2022: Assignment - Assignment of Beneficial Interest to Veronica Lynn Szikszoy

Bond - US Specialty

7/28/2022: Bond - US Specialty

Letters (Initial)

7/28/2022: Letters (Initial)

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

7/26/2022: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Order - Probate

7/25/2022: Order - Probate

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2023
  • Hearing11/22/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAssignment (Assignment of Beneficial Interest to Veronica Lynn Szikszoy )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketBond (US Specialty ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOrder - Probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement in Response to Probate Notes )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less