This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2019 at 10:50:20 (UTC).

SYSCO LOS ANGELES, INC. VS 6356 SECOND FLOOR, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 SYSCO LOS ANGELES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 6356 SECOND FLOOR, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0294

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYSCO LOS ANGELES INC.

Defendants

BRAIDY FREDDY

6356 SECOND FLOOR LLC DBA PROSPECT BEETLE HOUSE AKA BEETLE HOUSE LA AKA BEETLE HOUSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPIWAK LISA ELLEN

SPIWAK LISA E. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

NASSIF NICHOLAS STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Application - APPLICATION NUNC PRO TUNC TO CORRECT JUDGMENT DEBTOR FREDDY BRAIDY, AN INDIVIDUAL'S NAME IN JUDGMENT ENTERED APRIL 12, 2019

5/23/2019: Application - APPLICATION NUNC PRO TUNC TO CORRECT JUDGMENT DEBTOR FREDDY BRAIDY, AN INDIVIDUAL'S NAME IN JUDGMENT ENTERED APRIL 12, 2019

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

4/12/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment

4/12/2019: Judgment

Judgment

4/12/2019: Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

4/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 04/12/2019

4/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 04/12/2019

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/22/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/25/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/10/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/11/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration - Declaration re Method of Calculating Interest

12/11/2018: Declaration - Declaration re Method of Calculating Interest

Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

12/11/2018: Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

Request - Request for Dismissal of Doe Defendants without Prejudice

12/11/2018: Request - Request for Dismissal of Doe Defendants without Prejudice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/19/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

10/4/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

10/4/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -

10/4/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -

Complaint -

10/4/2018: Complaint -

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketApplication (Nunc Pro Tunc to Correct Judgment Debtor Freddy Braidy, an individual's Name in Judgment Entered April 12, 2019); Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 37; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (In Chambers Court Order Regarding Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (In Chambers Court Order Regarding Entry of Default Judgment) of 04/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 6356 Second Floor, LLC (Defendant); Freddy Braidy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketRequest (for Dismissal of Doe Defendants without Prejudice); Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (re Method of Calculating Interest); Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment); Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less