Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 13:24:01 (UTC).

SYLVIA SHAW, ET AL. VS MANTIS DEVELOPMENT, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 SYLVIA SHAW filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MANTIS DEVELOPMENT, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN and KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2947

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHAW JAMES

SHAW SYLVIA

Defendants

MANTIS DEVELOPMENT INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MARTINEZ RICHARD AKA RICKY MARTINEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'AMICO NICHOLAS LUCIANO

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/18/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/23/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/26/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/26/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/30/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/23/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order - Dismissal

5/17/2021: Order - Dismissal

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/17/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/29/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PROPOSED ORDER

12/18/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PROPOSED ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE O...)

12/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE O...)

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/19/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/19/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • Hearing08/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Re: Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Sylvia Shaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Deft. Richard Martinez) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Deft. Richard Martinez) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Mantis Development, Inc, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected); Filed by Sylvia Shaw (Plaintiff); James Shaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Directing Service o...) of 12/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Order); Filed by Sylvia Shaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Order Directing Service of Summons on Defendant Corporation Via Delivery to Secretary of State); Filed by Sylvia Shaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sylvia Shaw (Plaintiff); James Shaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sylvia Shaw (Plaintiff); James Shaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sylvia Shaw (Plaintiff); James Shaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sylvia Shaw (Plaintiff); James Shaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'AMICO NICHOLAS LUCIANO