This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 06:24:12 (UTC).

SYLVIA RIZZEN VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 SYLVIA RIZZEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0014

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIZZEN SYLVIA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA CARUSO FORD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA CARUSO FORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ ADAM M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

NARAIN SABRINA CELIA

ROEB CRAIG ALAN

SANDERS JUSTIN HAYS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

10/6/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 09/30/2020

9/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 09/30/2020

Case Management Order

9/17/2020: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS (INCLUDING MONETARY SAN...)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS (INCLUDING MONETARY SAN...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS (INCLUDING MONETARY SAN...) OF 09/17/2020, FSC TRIAL READINESS ORDER AND LEMON LAW ADDENDUM.

9/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS (INCLUDING MONETARY SAN...) OF 09/17/2020, FSC TRIAL READINESS ORDER AND LEMON LAW ADDENDUM.

Case Management Statement

9/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

9/3/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

8/7/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/12/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/12/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/28/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/28/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

7/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

7/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Proof of Personal Service

7/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

6/30/2020: Case Management Statement

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Jury Trial ((5-7 day est.)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((JT 11/08/2021)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((JT 11/08/2021)) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Sylvia Rizzen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 2:07 PM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 09/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why sanctions (including monetary sanctions of at least $500 and/or dismissal) should not be imposed for failure to serve all named defendants) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ford Motor Company, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ford Motor Company, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ford Motor Company, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sylvia Rizzen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sylvia Rizzen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sylvia Rizzen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sylvia Rizzen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROEB CRAIG A. ESQ.