This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 01:53:50 (UTC).

SYLVIA LEMBERSKI VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 SYLVIA LEMBERSKI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1098

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEMBERSKI SYLVIA

Defendants

CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CARE FOUNDATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLINGO JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/18/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/18/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/18/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/18/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/18/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Judicial Notice

2/23/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/23/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/23/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRYAN HICKEY

2/23/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRYAN HICKEY

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/23/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANTHONY J. ONCIDI

2/23/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANTHONY J. ONCIDI

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • Hearing06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • Hearing05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Sylvia Lemberski (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Anthony J. Oncidi; Filed by: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Bryan Hickey; Filed by: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Sylvia Lemberski (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sylvia Lemberski (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 01/24/2023; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sylvia Lemberski (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sylvia Lemberski (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sylvia Lemberski (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System, a California corporation (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Care Foundation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randolph M. Hammock in Department 49 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less