This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2019 at 03:35:19 (UTC).

SYLVIA LEE VS ALEXANDRA ESKIN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by SYLVIA LEE against ALEXANDRA ESKIN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6869

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LEE SYLVIA

Defendants and Respondents

ESKIN ALEXANDRA

ESKIN EUGENE

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PANAH D. HESS

YAZDANPANAH HESAM DEAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISS...)

10/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISS...)

Order - Dismissal

10/31/2019: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISS...) OF 10/31/2019

10/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISS...) OF 10/31/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

8/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

CoverSheet -

3/2/2018: CoverSheet -

Summons -

3/2/2018: Summons -

Complaint -

3/2/2018: Complaint -

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure of Plaintiff to Serve/Prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why This Action Should Not Be Dismiss...) of 10/31/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why This Action Should Not Be Dismiss...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sylvia Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696869    Hearing Date: December 20, 2019    Dept: 2

Lee v. Eskin et al.

Plaintiff’s Motion to Set Aside Dismissal Based on Attorney’s Excusable Neglect, filed on 11/25/19, is GRANTED. Cal. Code Civ. Proc. § 473(b).

Plaintiff’s motion is timely filed within six months of the dismissal as dismissal was entered on October 31, 2019 and the motion was filed on November 25, 2019. Additionally, Plaintiff has submitted a declaration from counsel setting forth that Plaintiff’s nonappearance at the OSC was due to the OSC date being erroneously calendared. This is sufficient to demonstrate that the dismissal was taken against Plaintiff due to Plaintiff’s counsel’s mistake, inadvertence, and excusable neglect.

Trial is set for 6/18/2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 2 and the Final Status Conference is set for 6/4/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 2.

Plaintiff is ordered to serve the summons and complaint on Defendant forthwith. The Court sets an OSC re: sanctions for failure to service of summons and complaint for 2/18/2020.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.